McDonough v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Rachel McDonough
Defendant: Capital One, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00984
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings)(Zinsner, Mary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Zinsner, Mary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Zinsner, Mary)
August 15, 2019 Intradistrict Transfer to Richmond Division. Case Number 3:19cv595. (smej, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that civil action 1:19cv984 be and is transferred to the Richmond Division to be consolidated with 3:19cv555. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/14/2019. (rban, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(lcre, )
July 31, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lcre, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. by Rachel McDonough. (Webster, Steven)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Capital One Financial Corporation by Rachel McDonough. (Webster, Steven)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Capital One, N.A. by Rachel McDonough. (Webster, Steven)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6764899.), filed by Rachel McDonough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Criminal Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webster, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonough v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel McDonough
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?