Aminov v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Emanuyel Aminov
Defendant: Capital One, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01006
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emanuyel Aminov as to Capital One Financial Corporation waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Murphy, Pierce) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (klau, ).
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emanuyel Aminov as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Murphy, Pierce) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (klau, ).
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Emanuyel Aminov. as to Capital One, N.A. waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Murphy, Pierce) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (klau, ).
August 17, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation. (Zinsner, Mary)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 8/16/2019. (rban, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings)(Zinsner, Mary)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 08/06/2019. (dvanm, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 08/06/2019. (dvanm, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 08/06/2019. (dvanm, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Dorothy P. Antullis and Certification of Local Counsel Pierce C. Murphy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6773038. by Emanuyel Aminov. (Murphy, Pierce)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher C. Gold and Certification of Local Counsel Pierce C. Murphy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6773032. by Emanuyel Aminov. (Murphy, Pierce)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stuart A. Davidson and Certification of Local Counsel Pierce C. Murphy Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6773014. by Emanuyel Aminov. (Murphy, Pierce)
August 2, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
August 2, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One, N.A. (Class Action) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6768789.), filed by Emanuyel Aminov. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buchman, Jodie) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aminov v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emanuyel Aminov
Represented By: Jodie Elizabeth Buchman
Represented By: Pierce Christopher Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?