Dames v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Dames
Defendant: Capital One N.A., Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01010
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that this civil action is transferred to the Richmond Division to be consolidated with 3:19CV555-(JAG) Heath, et al. V. Capital One Financial Corporation. The Clerk is directed to transfer this action as directed to the Richmond Division. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/20/19. (c/m on 8/20/19)(klau, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Intradistrict Transfer to Richmond Division per Order entered by Judge Hilton on 8/20/19. (Richmond Case No. 3:19cv607) (jtho, )
August 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, . Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
August 17, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One N.A., Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.. (Zinsner, Mary)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Hearing Date re #11 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, (Zinsner, Mary)
August 16, 2019 Notice of Correction re #11 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dest, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Order Staying Proceedings)(Zinsner, Mary)
August 14, 2019 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to #8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Naumon A. Amjed and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor by Deborah Dames. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6788418.. (Proctor, Haley)
August 14, 2019 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to #9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph H. Meltzer and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor by Deborah Dames. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6788424.. (Proctor, Haley)
August 14, 2019 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to #10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa L. Troutner and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor by Deborah Dames. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6788429.. (Proctor, Haley)
August 14, 2019 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to #7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David H. Thompson and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor by Deborah Dames. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6788372.. (Proctor, Haley)
August 14, 2019 Notice of Correction re #7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David H. Thompson and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor , #9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph H. Meltzer and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor , #8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Naumon A. Amjed and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor , #10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa L. Troutner and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor , The filing user has been notified to made electronic payment for Pro Hac Vice applications. (klau, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa L. Troutner and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor by Deborah Dames. (Proctor, Haley)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph H. Meltzer and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor by Deborah Dames. (Proctor, Haley)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Naumon A. Amjed and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor by Deborah Dames. (Proctor, Haley)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David H. Thompson and Certification of Local Counsel Haley N. Proctor by Deborah Dames. (Proctor, Haley)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Deborah Dames of Related Cases (Proctor, Haley)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued for Service by SPS as to Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One N.A.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
August 5, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Deborah Dames. (Proctor, Haley)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Deborah Dames. (Proctor, Haley)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Deborah Dames. (Proctor, Haley)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Capital One N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6771242.), filed by Deborah Dames. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment)(Proctor, Haley) Modified text on 8/5/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dames v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Mary Catherine Zinsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Dames
Represented By: Haley Marie Nix Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?