Plymouth County Retirement System v. Evolent Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Plymouth County Retirement System
Defendant: Evolent Health, Inc., Nicholas McGrane and Frank Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv01031
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 09/05/2019. (dvanm, )
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 09/05/2019. (dvanm, )
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 09/05/2019. (dvanm, )
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 09/05/2019. (dvanm, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jill R. Carvalho and Certification of Local Counsel Ashley C. Parrish Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6819718. by Evolent Health, Inc., Nicholas McGrane, Frank Williams. (Parrish, Ashley)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Tyler W. Highful and Certification of Local Counsel Ashley C. Parrish Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6819708. by Evolent Health, Inc., Nicholas McGrane, Frank Williams. (Parrish, Ashley)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael J. Biles and Certification of Local Counsel Ashley C. Parrish Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6819697. by Evolent Health, Inc., Nicholas McGrane, Frank Williams. (Parrish, Ashley)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul R. Bessette and Certification of Local Counsel Ashley C. Parrish Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6819675. by Evolent Health, Inc., Nicholas McGrane, Frank Williams. (Parrish, Ashley)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley C. Parrish on behalf of Evolent Health, Inc., Nicholas McGrane, Frank Williams (Parrish, Ashley)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Evolent Health, Inc., Nicholas McGrane, Frank Williams. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
August 8, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Nicholas McGrane by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Toll, Steven)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Frank Williams by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Toll, Steven)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Evolent Health, Inc. by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Toll, Steven)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6779599.), filed by Plymouth County Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Toll, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plymouth County Retirement System v. Evolent Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evolent Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley C. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas McGrane
Represented By: Ashley C. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Williams
Represented By: Ashley C. Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plymouth County Retirement System
Represented By: Steven Jeffrey Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?