Bowers, et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Van Gemert, Timothy Bowers and Jeffrey Stein
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and Audi of America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01043
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - This case is STAYED pending the JPML's decision on the Conditional Transfer Order. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Defendants' Motion to Continue are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 09/04/2019. (dvanm, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 Reply to Motion re #9 MOTION to Continue Hearing filed by Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Abrams, Kenneth)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Opposition to #9 MOTION to Continue Hearing filed by Timothy Bowers, Jeffrey Stein, David Van Gemert. (Miller, Charles)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Hearing by Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Abrams, Kenneth)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Continue Hearing filed by Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Abrams, Kenneth)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue Hearing by Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Abrams, Kenneth)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration re #7 Reply to Response to Motion by Timothy Bowers, Jeffrey Stein, David Van Gemert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration)(Miller, Charles)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Timothy Bowers, Jeffrey Stein, David Van Gemert. (Miller, Charles)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Abrams, Kenneth)
August 23, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Stay . Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Date re #3 MOTION to Stay (Abrams, Kenneth)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Stay filed by Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Abrams, Kenneth)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay by Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Abrams, Kenneth)
August 12, 2019 Notice of Correction re #2 MOTION to Remand . The filing user has been notified to file the document separately for each motion relief in the future. (clar, )
August 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand by Timothy Bowers, Jeffrey Stein, David Van Gemert. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Remanding this Case to Virginia State Court, #2 Notice of Hearing, #3 Declaration of Charles Miller, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #9 Proposed Order)(Miller, Charles)
August 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6781589.), filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi of America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Financial Disclosure)(Abrams, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers, et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Van Gemert
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bowers
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Stein
Represented By: Charles Wade Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi of America, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?