Wagoner v. Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Julie Wagoner
Defendant: Mark L. Gustina and Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions
Case Number: 1:2019cv01047
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(jlan)
October 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/25/2019 re #14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Bracken, David)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 Brief in Support filed by Mark L. Gustina. (Bracken, David)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mark L. Gustina. (Bracken, David)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/25/2019 re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Bracken, David)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions. (Bracken, David)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions. (Bracken, David)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Mark L. Gustina answer due 10/1/2019; Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions answer due 10/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/23/2019. (rban, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions. (Bracken, David)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mark L. Gustina. (Bracken, David)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions. (Bracken, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC on 08/23/19, filed by Julie Wagoner. (Erlich, Joshua)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Mark Gustina on 08/23/19, filed by Julie Wagoner. (Erlich, Joshua)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions, Mark L. Gustina. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (rban, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Julie Wagoner. (Erlich, Joshua)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Julie Wagoner. (Erlich, Joshua)
August 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (pmil, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Cranberry hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions and Mark L. Gustina filed by Julie Wagoner (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6782528). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Herrmann, Katherine) Modified on 8/12/2019 to add defts' to entry (pmil, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagoner v. Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L. Gustina
Represented By: Joshua Harry Erlich
Represented By: David Scott Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cranberry Hearing and Balance Center, LLC d/b/a Cosmetic Hearing Solutions
Represented By: Joshua Harry Erlich
Represented By: David Scott Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Wagoner
Represented By: Katherine Lynn Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?