Chicas v. Golden Buffet & Sushi, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marcos Reyes Chicas
Defendant: Golden Buffet & Sushi, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01053
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Golden Buffet & Sushi, Inc. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (dvanm, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Golden Buffet & Sushi, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
August 12, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Marcos Reyes Chicas. (Greenberg, Gregg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6783726.), filed by Marcos Reyes Chicas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greenberg, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chicas v. Golden Buffet & Sushi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Buffet & Sushi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Reyes Chicas
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?