Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund et al v. Air Wise Heating & Cooling, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, National Energy Management Institute Committee, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust and Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry
Defendant: Air Wise Heating & Cooling, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01057
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Board of Trustees, National Energy Management Institute Committee Air Wise Heating & Cooling, Inc. served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019 (Bardes, Diana)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Air Wise Heating & Cooling, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Board of Trustees, National Energy Management Institute Committee, Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund. (Bardes, Diana)
August 13, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (pmil, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6786439.), filed by Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund, Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust, Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund, Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry, Board of Trustees, National Energy Management Institute Committee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bardes, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund et al v. Air Wise Heating & Cooling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, National Stabilization Agreement of Sheet Metal Industry Trust Fund
Represented By: Diana Migliaccio Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, National Energy Management Institute Committee
Represented By: Diana Migliaccio Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers' National Pension Fund
Represented By: Diana Migliaccio Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Occupational Health Institute Trust
Represented By: Diana Migliaccio Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees, International Training Institute for the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Industry
Represented By: Diana Migliaccio Bardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Wise Heating & Cooling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?