Ghadiali v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali
Defendant: Sarah Taylor, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv01064
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 So Ordered re #14 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Kevin K. McAleenan, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Sarah Taylor. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/27/2019. (lcre, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K. McAleenan, Sarah Taylor. (Barghaan, Dennis)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr on behalf of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K. McAleenan, Sarah Taylor (Barghaan, Dennis)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali. All Defendants (US Attorney for Eastern District of VA) (Khanna, Rajiv) Modified on 9/9/2019 (lcre, ).
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali. All Defendants (US Attorney General). (Khanna, Rajiv) Modified on 9/9/2019 (lcre, ).
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali. Sarah Taylor served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Khanna, Rajiv)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali. Kevin K. McAleenan served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Receipt Mailed certified and tracked delivery)(Khanna, Rajiv)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II served on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Mailed certified and tracked delivery)(Khanna, Rajiv)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (rban, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Khanna, Rajiv)
August 16, 2019 Notified the attorney for plaintiff that summons needed to be issued for the US Attorney and US Attorney General. (rban, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II, Kevin K. McAleenan, Sarah Taylor. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (rban, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Khanna, Rajiv)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khanna, Rajiv)
August 15, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified that document is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has not been completed. The document has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document re #2 Proposed Summons (lcre, )
August 15, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified that document [document number] is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document re [1-2] Civil Cover Sheet (lcre, )
August 15, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lcre, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Khanna, Rajiv)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6789317.), filed by Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khanna, Rajiv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghadiali v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Taylor
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, II
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alifiya Huzefa Ghadiali
Represented By: Rajiv Santosh Khanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?