United States of America v. Batistas et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Vatistas Batistas and Eugenia Batistas
Case Number: 1:2019cv01066
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Mene on behalf of United States of America (Mene, Gerard)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Michael Martineau. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/12/2019. (acha, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Martineau and Certification of Local Counsel Gerard Mene by United States of America. (Mene, Gerard)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Eugenia Batistas, Vatistas Batistas. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Vatistas Batistas by United States of America. (Mene, Gerard)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Eugenia Batistas by United States of America. (Mene, Gerard)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, For Federal Taxes by United States of America. (Mene, Gerard)
August 15, 2019 Notice of Correction re [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, The filing user has been notified that Civil Cover Sheet is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. The filing user has been notified to refile the summons [1-2] [1-3] separately. (klau, )
August 15, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Vatistas Batistas, Eugenia Batistas For Federal Taxes, filed by United States Of America Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Document filed in error and removed re Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons Vatistas Batistas, #3 summons Eugenia Batistas)(Mene, Gerard) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (klau, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/15/2019) (klau, ). Modified text on 8/15/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Batistas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vatistas Batistas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugenia Batistas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gerard J. Mene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?