Vann v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Eric M. Vann
Defendant: Jim Davis, Shannon C. Shaffoson, Norfolk City Jail, Jason Wilson, E.M.E. Turner and Virginia Center for Behavioral Rehabilitation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01072
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric M. Vann. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Letter to the Court by Plaintiff Eric M. Vann (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(choy, )
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that WITHIN TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the entry date of this Order Vann (A) PAY the $400 due om case initiation fees, (B) SUBMIT a complete application for permission to proceed in forma pauperis, or (C) file a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(I). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 09/05/2019. (Attachments: #1 Applicaiton to Proceed om District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs)(choy, c/m to Plaintiff on 09/05/2019 )
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (rban, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jim Davis, Norfolk City Jail, Shannon C. Shaffoson, E.M.E. Turner, Virginia Center for Behavioral Rehabilitation, Jason Wilson, filed by Eric M. Vann. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Report Prisoner Data)(rban, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vann v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon C. Shaffoson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk City Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.M.E. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Center for Behavioral Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric M. Vann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?