Russ v. Tiernan
Plaintiff: Justin M. Russ
Defendant: Peter Tiernan
Case Number: 1:2019cv01073
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Justin M. Russ. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dvanm, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (pmil, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the complaint be and is filed pending compliance with the requirements of this order. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 09/23/2019. (dvanm, c/m 9/24/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (dvanm, c/m 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter Tiernan, filed by Justin M. Russ. (Attachments: #1 Data Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russ v. Tiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Tiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin M. Russ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?