Pizzella v. Ferraco et al
Plaintiff: Department of Labor, Acting Secretary of Labor, Patrick Pizzella and Patrick Pizzella
Defendant: Steven Vento, Nathaniel Ferraco, DTREDS, LLC 401(K) Retirement Plan and DTREDS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01090
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Steven Vento by Patrick Pizzella as to Steven Vento. (Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 9/27/2019 (klau, ).
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service Returned Executed for Summons, Notice and Complaint as to Nathaniel Ferraco served on September 23, 2019, Answer due 10/14/19, filed by Patrick Pizzella. (Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 9/27/2019 (klau, ).
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service Returned Executed for Summons, Notice and Complaint as to DTREDS served (Thomas Tucker, Authorized Agent) on September 17, 2019, Answer due 10/8/19, filed by Patrick Pizzella. (Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 9/27/2019 (klau, ).
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service Returned Executed for Summons and Complaint as to DTREDS 401(k) served on (Thomas Tucker, Authorized Agent) September 17, 2019, Answer due 10/8/19 ,filed by Patrick Pizzella. (Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 9/27/2019 (klau, ).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/21/2019. (rban, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to DTREDS, LLC, DTREDS, LLC 401(K) Retirement Plan, Nathaniel Ferraco, Steven Vento. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, Amended by Patrick Pizzella. (Lewis, Ryma)
August 19, 2019 Notice of Correction erroneously sent to counsel re [1-2] [1-3] [1-4] [1-5] Proposed Summons, Counsel Do Not need to refile. (klau, ) Modified text on 8/19/2019 (klau, ).
August 19, 2019 Notice of Correction re [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, An incomplete (document not signed) document was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document. (klau, )
August 19, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Geoffrey Forney and Certification of Local Counsel Ryma Lewis by Department of Labor, Acting Secretary of Labor, Patrick Pizzella. (Lewis, Ryma)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Geoffrey Forney and Certification of Local Counsel Ryma Lewis by Department of Labor, Acting Secretary of Labor, Patrick Pizzella. (Lewis, Ryma)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Nathaniel Ferraco, Steven Vento, DTREDS, LLC, DTREDS, LLC 401(K) Retirement Plan , filed by Patrick Pizzella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #5 Exhibit Proposed Summons)(Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 8/19/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizzella v. Ferraco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Vento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Ferraco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTREDS, LLC 401(K) Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTREDS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Department of Labor, Acting Secretary of Labor, Patrick Pizzella
Represented By: Ryma Naje Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Pizzella
Represented By: Ryma Naje Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?