United States Internal Revenue Service v. Hatchell
Plaintiff: United States Internal Revenue Service
Defendant: William H Hatchell
Case Number: 1:2019cv01108
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to William H. Hatchell (clar, )
October 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to William H. Hatchell. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 Roseboro Notice as to William H. Hatchell and Notice of Hearing on November 1, 2019 by United States Internal Revenue Service (Carter, Kieran)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to William H. Hatchell filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kerry Clancey, #2 Second Declaration of Kieran Carter, #3 Exhibit A - Income Tax Account Transcripts, #4 Exhibit B - Civil Penalty Account Transcripts, #5 Exhibit C - SCRA Report)(Carter, Kieran)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to William H. Hatchell by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Default Judgment)(Carter, Kieran)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to William H Hatchell. (jlan)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that promptly after obtaining the entry of default, plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file a motion for default judgment and an accompanying memorandum (see order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/08/2019. (jlan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Entry of Default as to William H. Hatchell by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Entry of Default, #2 Declaration of Kieran O. Carter, #3 Exhibit A - SCRA Report)(Carter, Kieran)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Internal Revenue Service William H Hatchell served on 9/2/2019, answer due 9/23/2019 (Carter, Kieran)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran O'Neill Carter on behalf of United States Internal Revenue Service (Carter, Kieran)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William H Hatchell. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
August 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (jlan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Anderson, Krista)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Krista)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Internal Revenue Service v. Hatchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Krista M. Anderson
Represented By: Kieran O'Neill Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H Hatchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?