Jones v. Branch Banking & Trust Co. of Virginia
Plaintiff: Bernadette Jones
Defendant: Branch Banking & Trust Co. of Virginia
Case Number: 1:2019cv01110
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Bernadette Jones as to Branch Banking & Trust Co. of Virginia. (Kelly, Kristi)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bernadette Jones. Branch Banking & Trust Co. of Virginia waiver sent on 8/23/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Kelly, Kristi)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Branch Banking & Trust Co. of Virginia. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(aott, )
August 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (aott, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Guzzo on behalf of Bernadette Jones (Guzzo, Andrew)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Cahoon Kelly on behalf of Bernadette Jones (Kelly, Kristi)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Bernadette Jones. (Nash, Casey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6804006.), filed by Bernadette Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nash, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Branch Banking & Trust Co. of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Jones
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Banking & Trust Co. of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?