Gomez v. Seoul Gool Dae Gee Inc.
Plaintiff: ESVIN ROMERO
Defendant: SEOUL GOOL DAE GEE INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01121
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 68 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2019. (dvanm, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Seoul Gool Dae Gee Inc. (Petersen, John)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Seoul Gool Dae Gee Inc.. (Petersen, John)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(jlan)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/02/2019. (dvanm, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter K. Hwang and Certification of Local Counsel J. Chapman Petersen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6862947. by Seoul Gool Dae Gee Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order Order)(Petersen, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Seoul Gool Dae Gee Inc..(Petersen, John)
August 28, 2019 Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that document #2 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (dvanm, )
August 27, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Esvin Gomez. (Kaplan, Matthew) Modified on 8/28/2019 (dvanm, ). (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/28/2019) (dvanm, ).
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6809132.), filed by Esvin Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaplan, Matthew) Modified on 8/28/2019 (dvanm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Seoul Gool Dae Gee Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESVIN ROMERO
Represented By: Matthew Bryce Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEOUL GOOL DAE GEE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?