United States of America on behalf of Salt Energy, LLC v. Lexon Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Salt Energy, LLC
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01124
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:0270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Salt Energy, LLC. (Westerfield, Mark)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(jlan)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice of David Roy Elder. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/4/2019. (lcre, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Roy Elder and Certification of Local Counsel Mark Gibson Westerfield Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6865282. by Salt Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Westerfield, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Salt Energy, LLC Plaintiff's Financial Disclosure Statement (Westerfield, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Gibson Westerfield on behalf of Salt Energy, LLC (Westerfield, Mark)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lexon Insurance Company.(Franco, Craig)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-20473. Original file and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Transfer Case. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Lexon Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 8/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Craig J. Franco. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (mmc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Craig J. Franco. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11578448 by Lexon Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichhorn, Cory) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Lexon Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Declaration of Jonathan Ahmed)(Eichhorn, Cory) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative to Transfer filed by Salt Energy, LLC. Replies due by 4/8/2019. (Elder, David) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file a response on or before April 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2019. (mmc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Salt Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Elder, David) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Lexon Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Task Order, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jonathan Ahmed)(Eichhorn, Cory) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexon Insurance Company (Eichhorn, Cory) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lexon Insurance Company. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Lexon Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11370243, filed by United States of America on behalf of Salt Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summon(s))(Elder, David) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America on behalf of Salt Energy, LLC v. Lexon Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salt Energy, LLC
Represented By: David Roy Elder
Represented By: Mark Gibson Westerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig James Franco
Represented By: Cory William Eichhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?