Depositors Insurance Company v. RB Hinkle Construction, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Depositors Insurance Company
Defendant: PLH Group, Inc and RB Hinkle Construction, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01128
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Depositors Insurance Company PLH Group, Inc served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019 (spar)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gretchen Ann Jackson on behalf of PLH Group, Inc, RB Hinkle Construction, Inc (Jackson, Gretchen)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Compliance PLH Group, Inc served on 10/11/2019, answer due 11/1/2019. (jlan)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by PLH Group, Inc, RB Hinkle Construction, Inc. (Zuk, Peter Nicholas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by PLH Group, Inc, RB Hinkle Construction, Inc.(Zuk, Peter Nicholas)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed RB Hinkle Construction, Inc served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (jlan)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice of Erick J. Kirker. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/18/2019. (lcre, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to PLH Group, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons on PLH Grp, Inc c/o Secretary of the Commonwealth by Depositors Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick J. Kirker and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6834740. by Depositors Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to PLH Group, Inc, RB Hinkle Construction, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued, #2 Notice to Attorney)(aott, )
August 29, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (aott, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Depositors Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint on PLH Group, Inc through the Sec. of the Commonwealth by Depositors Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Rosenblum, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint on Registered Agent of RB Hinkle, CT Corporation System, R.A. by Depositors Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6812401.), filed by Depositors Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenblum, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depositors Insurance Company v. RB Hinkle Construction, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLH Group, Inc
Represented By: Peter Nicholas Yaroslav Zuk
Represented By: Gretchen Ann Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RB Hinkle Construction, Inc
Represented By: Peter Nicholas Yaroslav Zuk
Represented By: Gretchen Ann Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Depositors Insurance Company
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?