Bitseller Expert Limited et al v. Verisign Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Bitseller Expert Limited and Accuracy Consulting Ltd.
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Verisign Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01140
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
October 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Hearing Date re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Hyland, Timothy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Verisign Inc.. (Hyland, Timothy)
October 21, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Verisign Inc.. (Hyland, Timothy)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/17/19. (klau, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald L. Johnston and Certification of Local Counsel Timothy B. Hyland Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6886893. by Verisign Inc.. (Hyland, Timothy)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/09/2019. (dvanm, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/9/2019. (dvanm, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that the deadline for Verisign to respond to the Complaint is extended from October 10, 2019 to October 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/04/2019. (wgar, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by E. Christopher Beeler and Certification of Local Counsel Timothy B. Hyland Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6872111. by Verisign Inc.. (Hyland, Timothy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James S. Blackburn and Certification of Local Counsel Timothy B. Hyland Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6872106. by Verisign Inc.. (Hyland, Timothy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Verisign Inc.. (Hyland, Timothy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of re #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleadings of Oral Argument by Verisign Inc. (Hyland, Timothy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleadings by Verisign Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hyland, Timothy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Southwick on behalf of Verisign Inc. (Southwick, Tyler)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Brooks Hyland on behalf of Verisign Inc. (Hyland, Timothy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Verisign Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons by Accuracy Consulting Ltd., Bitseller Expert Limited. (Geiger, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/6/19. (klau, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/6/19. (klau, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Shayefar and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Hamilton Geiger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6819294. by Accuracy Consulting Ltd., Bitseller Expert Limited. (Geiger, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Valentin David Gurvits and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Hamilton Geiger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6819279. by Accuracy Consulting Ltd., Bitseller Expert Limited. (Geiger, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against Verisign Inc. and Does 1-10, ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6818289.), filed by Bitseller Expert Limited, Accuracy Consulting Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Bitseller - Financial Disclosure, #5 Exhibit Accuracy Consulting - Financial Disclosure)(Geiger, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/4/2019 (klau, ).
September 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bitseller Expert Limited et al v. Verisign Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verisign Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Brooks Hyland
Represented By: Tyler Southwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bitseller Expert Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey Hamilton Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accuracy Consulting Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey Hamilton Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?