Scholl v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Xavier Scholl
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01195
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security, SSA (Social Security Administration). (McCotter, R.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Trent McCotter on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security, SSA (Social Security Administration) (McCotter, R.)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xavier Scholl. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Gillikin, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
September 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (acha, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons all 3 summonses by Xavier Scholl. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Gillikin, Robert)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6840323.), filed by Xavier Scholl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillikin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scholl v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Scholl
Represented By: Robert Wayne Gillikin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?