Datta v. Fairfax County Public School
Plaintiff: Ripon K. Datta
Defendant: Fairfax County Public School
Case Number: 1:2019cv01227
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William Boyle Porter on behalf of Fairfax County Public School (Porter, William)
November 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
November 7, 2019 CLERK'S ERROR RE: Notice of Correction re: #10 Notice of Hearing Date, #11 (Amended) Notice of Hearing Date. The hearing time of 10:00 a.m. that was originally noted in the Notice of Hearing filed at doc. no. 10 is correct. (pmil, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date (Amended) re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Randall, Lauren)
November 7, 2019 Notice of Correction re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #10 Notice of Hearing Date. Please re-file a Corrected/Amended Notice of Hearing setting the Motion to Dismiss for 11:00 a.m. (pmil, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Randall, Lauren)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fairfax County Public School. (Randall, Lauren)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fairfax County Public School. (Randall, Lauren)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Fairfax County Public School served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (acha, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Fairfax County Public School by USMS. (acha, )
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Sealed ORDER GRANTING #2 Application/Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/03/19. (pmil, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 09/23/19. (pmil, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Ripon K. Datta. (pmil, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION/MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ripon K. Datta. (pmil, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fairfax County Public School filed by Ripon K. Datta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pmil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Datta v. Fairfax County Public School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ripon K. Datta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfax County Public School
Represented By: Lauren Fredericksen Randall
Represented By: William Boyle Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?