General Insurance Company of America v. Calderon
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Yackeline Calderon
Case Number: 1:2019cv01229
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #8 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for November 6, 2019, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's October 10, 2019 Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 10/31/2019. (lgue, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Discovery Plan by General Insurance Company of America.(Stephens, Edwin)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Yackeline Calderon.(Gore, Mark)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Britton Gore on behalf of Yackeline Calderon (Gore, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Yackeline Calderon. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
September 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (acha, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by General Insurance Company of America. (Stephens, Edwin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Insurance Company of America. (Stephens, Edwin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6850870.), filed by General Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephens, Edwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Insurance Company of America v. Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yackeline Calderon
Represented By: Mark Britton Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Edwin Ford Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?