United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v Quality Midwestern Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: EEOC and United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: QUALITY MIDWESTERN HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a/ QUALITY SERVICES MOVING and Quality Midwestern Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01251
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Quality Midwestern Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 10/10/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Morocco, Maria)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/03/2019. (dvanm, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melanie Marie Peterson and Certification of Local Counsel Maria Luisa Morocco by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Morocco, Maria)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Morocco, Maria)
September 30, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Civil Cover Sheet attached to Complaint. The filing user has been notified that the Civil Cover Sheet is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (dvanm, )
September 27, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by EEOC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morocco, Maria) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/30/2019) (dvanm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v Quality Midwestern Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUALITY MIDWESTERN HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a/ QUALITY SERVICES MOVING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Midwestern Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EEOC
Represented By: Maria Luisa Morocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Maria Luisa Morocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?