Brooks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Andrew Brooks
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01256
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the parties are DIRECTED to comply with the following schedule: 1. Defendant shall file an answer and a copy of the administrative record within sixty ( 60) days of being served with a summons and copy of the complaint. ---- A request for oral argument must be filed with any motion for summary judgment or opposition to such motion. The Court will then decide whether oral argument will aid the decisional process. (see order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/3/19. (Attachments: #1 MagistrateJudge Consent Form)(klau, ) Modified on 10/4/2019 Copy sent to U.S. Attorney Office.(klau, ).
October 1, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6862822.), filed by Andrew Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ashe, David) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Brooks
Represented By: David Benjamin Ashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?