Echols v. Arafa Real Estate, LLC
Appellee: Arafa Real Estate, LLC
Appellant: Virginia Echols
Interested Party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01258
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (spar)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 11/27/2019. (spar)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet together with designation of record. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Record)(spar)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 11/18/2019 see order for further details.Copies sent to Appellant (spar)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Appeal Record)(spar)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-12958-KHK. File received filed by Virginia Echols. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(jlan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echols v. Arafa Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Arafa Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Justin Philip Fasano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Virginia Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?