Henderson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Tonya Henderson
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv01284
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Tonya Henderson Filing Disclosure 26(a)1 (Morrison, Thomas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Tonya Henderson Filing Discovery (Morrison, Thomas)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #5 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 30, 2019, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's October 9, 2019 Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 10/28/2019. (lgue, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Discovery Plan by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(France, Angela)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
October 8, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lcre, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (France, Angela)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(France, Angela)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6876454.), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(France, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Angela Hope France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Henderson
Represented By: Thomas Bennett Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?