Q.T., et al v. Fairfax County School Board, et. al.
Plaintiff: C. T., Q. T., Autistic Self Advocacy Network, D. O., Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Communication First and A. O.
Defendant: Dr. Scott Braband, Teresa Johnson and Fairfax County School Board
Case Number: 1:2019cv01285
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
2 Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, Setting Filing Schedule for Amended Complaint and Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, and Temporarily Staying Issuance of Scheduling Order by Scott Braband, Fairfax County School Board, Teresa Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Filing and Briefing Schedule and Temporarily Staying Issuance of Scheduling Order)(Raphael, Stuart)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Sharon Krevor-Weisbaum. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/16/2019. (acha, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice for Regina Kline. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/16/2019. (acha, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Eve Lynne Hill. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/16/2019. (acha, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Anthony Jovi May. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/16/2019. (acha, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharon Krevor-Weisbaum and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin E. Byrnes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6882571. by Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Communication First, Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, A. O., D. O., C. T., Q. T.. (Byrnes, Kevin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Regina Kline and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin E. Byrnes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6882564. by Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Communication First, Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, A. O., D. O., C. T., Q. T.. (Byrnes, Kevin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eve Lynne Hill and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin E. Byrnes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6882552. by Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Communication First, Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, A. O., D. O., C. T., Q. T.. (Byrnes, Kevin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Jovi May and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin E. Byrnes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6882528. by Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Communication First, Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, A. O., D. O., C. T., Q. T.. (Byrnes, Kevin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Autistic Self Advocacy Network, D. O., Communication First, A. O., C. T., Q. T., Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates. Scott Braband waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Fairfax County School Board waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019; Teresa Johnson waiver sent on 10/8/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Byrnes, Kevin)
October 9, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema no longer assigned to the case. (acha, )
October 8, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (acha, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Fairfax County School Board, Dr. Scott Braband, and Teresa Johnson, filed by Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Communication First, Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, A. O., D. O., C. T., Q. T.. (Byrnes, Kevin) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/10/2019) filed in error per clerk's notification (acha, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6876713.), filed by Autistic Self Advocacy Network, D. O., Communication First, A. O., C. T., Q. T., Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Byrnes, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Q.T., et al v. Fairfax County School Board, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. T.
Represented By: Kevin Edward Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q. T.
Represented By: Kevin Edward Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autistic Self Advocacy Network
Represented By: Kevin Edward Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. O.
Represented By: Kevin Edward Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates
Represented By: Kevin Edward Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Communication First
Represented By: Kevin Edward Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. O.
Represented By: Kevin Edward Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Scott Braband
Represented By: Stuart Alan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Johnson
Represented By: Stuart Alan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfax County School Board
Represented By: Stuart Alan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?