Ruppert Landscape, Inc v. Forrester Construction Company et. al.
Plaintiff: Ruppert Landscape, Inc
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company and Forrester Construction Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01327
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/04/19. (pmil, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Lee Grant and Certification of Local Counsel Ralph D. Rinaldi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6963191. by Ruppert Landscape, Inc. (Rinaldi, Ralph)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruppert Landscape, Inc Federal Insurance Company served on 10/30/2019, answer due 12/20/2019 (Rinaldi, Ralph)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ruppert Landscape, Inc Forrester Construction Company served on 10/30/2019, answer due 12/20/2019 (Rinaldi, Ralph)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Federal Insurance Company answer due 12/20/2019; Forrester Construction Company answer due 12/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 11/21/2019. (rban, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Federal Insurance Company, Forrester Construction Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Newland, James)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ruppert Landscape, Inc. (Rinaldi, Ralph)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company, Forrester Construction Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
October 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Defendant Federal Insurance by Ruppert Landscape, Inc. (Rinaldi, Ralph)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Defendant Forrester by Ruppert Landscape, Inc. (Rinaldi, Ralph)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6893314.), filed by Ruppert Landscape, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rinaldi, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruppert Landscape, Inc v. Forrester Construction Company et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruppert Landscape, Inc
Represented By: Ralph Daniel Rinaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: James Raymond Newland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrester Construction Company
Represented By: James Raymond Newland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?