Sun West Mortgage Company, Inc. v. Diawatan et al
Appellant: Sun West Mortgage Company, Inc.
Interested Party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Appellee: Mae Loren Munoz Diawatan and Dennis Reyes' Diawatan
Case Number: 1:2019cv01332
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 2/7/2020at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
November 21, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Argument on Bankruptcy Appeal set for 2/7/2019a t 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (choy, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 12/21/2019. (choy, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet with Designation of Record. (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet-Record)(choy, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-11962-KHK. File received, filed by Sun West Mortgage Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notice)(choy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun West Mortgage Company, Inc. v. Diawatan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sun West Mortgage Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Kevin Eisenhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mae Loren Munoz Diawatan
Represented By: Madeline Agnes Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dennis Reyes' Diawatan
Represented By: Madeline Agnes Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?