Precision Franchising LLC, v. Melanie Auto Care, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Precision Franchising LLC,
Defendant: Frank Hernandez, Melanie Auto Care, Inc. and Eloisa Hernandez
Case Number: 1:2019cv01341
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED re #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/25/2019. (dvanm, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Precision Franchising LLC, (Sallis, Justin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Eloisa Hernandez, Frank Hernandez, Melanie Auto Care, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
October 22, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Melanie Auto Care, Inc., Frank Hernandez, and Eloisa Hernandez by Precision Franchising LLC,. (Sallis, Justin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Precision Franchising LLC,. (Sallis, Justin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6900742.), filed by Precision Franchising LLC,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Guaranty Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sallis, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Franchising LLC, v. Melanie Auto Care, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Auto Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eloisa Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Franchising LLC,
Represented By: Justin Lydell Sallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?