Kniaz, et al. v. Kay Managemnt Company, et al.
Plaintiff: Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips and HOME
Defendant: Kay Managemnt Company, Kay Jack et al, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Indian River Associates, LLC and Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership
Case Number: 1:2019cv01343
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 So Ordered re #96 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership, Indian River Associates, LLC, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, Kay Jack et al, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Kay Managemnt Company. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 06/24/2020. (dvanm, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal Corrected by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Ward, Margaret)
June 22, 2020 Filing 95 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Ward, Margaret)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #82 Motion to Seal Exhibits K and N to its Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 06/22/2020. (jlan)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production #78 is DENEID as moot given the status of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 6/9/2020. (dvanm, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PARTIAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS BY CONSENT ORDER that 1. It is declared that the Defendants' former policy of automatically rejecting all applicants with criminal convictions was inconsistent with the Virginia Fair Housing Law ----- 11. The Court will retain jurisdiction of this Consent Order to enforce the terms of this order for a two-year period from the date of entry of this Order (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 6/9/20. (klau, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Margaret)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on the parties" joint notice. #89 . By that notice, filed May 28, 2020, the parties informed the Court that they "reached an understanding regarding settlement." They request that the Court defer ruling on a pending motion until after June 5, 2020, to allow them time to submit final terms for entry. Accordingly, the parties shall jointly file such terms for entry no later than June 5, 2020. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/29/2020. (dvanm, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips re #73 Consent MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings and Curtail Discovery (Anderson, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Settlement Conference held on 5/27/2020. Plaintiffs and Defendants were present. The conference lasted 4 hours and 20 minutes. The parties settled. (lgue, )
May 27, 2020 Per LO chambers motions set for 5/29/2020 on the pleadings (clar, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 Consent MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings and Curtail Discovery filed by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ward, Margaret)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER - FOR REASONS stated during the Zoom motion hearing and in accord with specific rulings and instructions thereto, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production #78 is held in abeyance until the May 28, 2020 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 5/22/2020. (lgue, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2020 re #78 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests For Production filed by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. Appearances of Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants via Zoom. Motion argued and held in abeyance. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(lgue, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 85 Opposition to #73 Consent MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings and Curtail Discovery filed by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Anderson, Michael)
May 20, 2020 Filing 84 Sealed Document re #82 MOTION to Seal Exhibits K and N to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel ECF No. 78. (Anderson, Michael)
May 20, 2020 Filing 83 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips re #82 MOTION to Seal Exhibits K and N to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel ECF No. 78 (Anderson, Michael)
May 20, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION to Seal Exhibits K and N to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel ECF No. 78 by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Seal)(Anderson, Michael)
May 20, 2020 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests For Production filed by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ward, Margaret)
May 20, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #78 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests For Production. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2020 at 02:00 PM by ZOOM before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (clar, )
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #77 Motion to Amend the Schedule. Discovery shall close August 31, 2020, and the Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for September 18, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 5/19/2020. (dvanm, )
May 19, 2020 Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (see #80 Order) (dvanm, )
May 18, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #78 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests For Production. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (clar, )
May 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Davis. #78 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests For Production (clar, )
May 18, 2020 Notice of Correction re #79 NOTICE. Incorrect Docket Event. (clar, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE oh Hearing Date re #78 Motion to Compel by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips (Anderson, Michael) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (clar, ).
May 15, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests For Production by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Anderson, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Filing 77 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Schedule by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amending Schedule)(Anderson, Michael)
May 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #73 Consent MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings and Curtail Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
May 13, 2020 Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 09:30 AM via ZOOM before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lgue, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 76 Notice of Hearing Date set for 05/29/2020 re #73 Consent MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings and Curtail Discovery (Ward, Margaret)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #72 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Paul Poirot.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 5/8/2020. (dvanm, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips re #73 Consent MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings and Curtail Discovery (Anderson, Michael)
May 6, 2020 Filing 73 Consent MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings and Curtail Discovery by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Margaret)
May 6, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Paul Poirot by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Michael)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Charles Guzak.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/26/2020. (dvanm, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Michael)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/25/2020. (see order for details) (dvanm, )
March 25, 2020 Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (see order #69 for details) (dvanm, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Ward, Margaret)
March 9, 2020 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, Kay Jack et al, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Kay Managemnt Company, Indian River Associates, LLC, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Ward, Margaret)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #63 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 11, 2020, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's February 7, 2020, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/06/2020. (lgue, )
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Joint Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/5/2020. (dvanm, ) Modified on 3/6/2020 (aott, ).
March 4, 2020 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated [Proposed] by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
March 4, 2020 Filing 63 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips.(Anderson, Michael)
March 2, 2020 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, Kay Jack et al, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Kay Managemnt Company, Indian River Associates, LLC, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ward, Margaret)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER finding as moot #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 2/13/2020. (Davis, Ivan)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Azadeh Erfani terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 2/11/2020. (dvanm, )
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Discovery due by 7/10/2020.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(awac, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips re #57 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney providing proposed order (Erfani, Azadeh)
February 7, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Erfani, Azadeh)
January 21, 2020 Filing 56 ANSWER to Complaint Amended by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership.(Ward, Margaret)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Alicia D. Stewart. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/9/2020. (dvanm, )
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying as moot #46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 01/08/2020. (dvanm, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 53 EXHIBIT Signed Application by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership.. (Ward, Margaret)
January 3, 2020 Filing 52 Opposition to #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial filed by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Michael)
January 3, 2020 Filing 51 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kuir Phillips, Mara B Kniaz, HOME. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Michael)
December 31, 2019 Filing 50 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alicia D. Stewart and Certification of Local Counsel Margaret Fonshell Ward Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7004496. by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ward, Margaret)
December 30, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Correction: Attorney has been notified to sign the document re #48 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alicia D. Stewart and Certification of Local Counsel Margaret Fonshell Ward Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7001744. (lcre, )
December 29, 2019 Filing 48 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alicia D. Stewart and Certification of Local Counsel Margaret Fonshell Ward Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7001744. by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Ward, Margaret)
December 20, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership.(Ward, Margaret)
December 20, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial by Kay Jack et al, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Ward, Margaret)
December 20, 2019 Notice of Correction re #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Partial The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (clar, )
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Pro hac vice for Sarah Elizabeth Watson. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/6/2019. (acha, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 44 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Elizabeth Watson and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6970339. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Erfani, Azadeh)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Thomas Silverstein. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/3/2019. (dvanm, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Hannah Elizabeth Miller Lieberman. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/3/2019. (dvanm, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Catherine Cone. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/3/2019. (dvanm, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Brook Allarick Hill. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/3/2019. (dvanm, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 39 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Silverstein and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6963952. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Erfani, Azadeh)
December 2, 2019 Filing 38 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Hannah Elizabeth Miller Lieberman and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6963934. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Erfani, Azadeh)
December 2, 2019 Filing 37 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine Cone and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6963921. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Erfani, Azadeh)
December 2, 2019 Filing 36 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brook Allarick Hill and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6963875. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Erfani, Azadeh)
November 29, 2019 Filing 35 Consent Motion to Extend Time for Responsive Pleading by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Proposed Order)(choy, )
November 28, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Azadeh Erfani on behalf of HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips (Erfani, Azadeh)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/27/2019. Indian River Associates, LLC answer due 12/20/2019; Kay Jack et al answer due 12/20/2019; Kay Managemnt Company answer due 12/20/2019; Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership answer due 12/20/2019; North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership answer due 12/20/2019; Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership answer due 12/20/2019. (lcre, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Submission: Consent Order by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership.. (Ward, Margaret) Modified on 11/27/2019 (lcre, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Indian River Associates, LLC, Kay Jack et al, Kay Managemnt Company, Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership, North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership, Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership. (Ward, Margaret)
November 25, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kuir Phillips, Mara B Kniaz, HOME Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 (Anderson, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kuir Phillips, Mara B Kniaz, HOME North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 (Anderson, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kuir Phillips, Mara B Kniaz, HOME Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 (Anderson, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kuir Phillips, Mara B Kniaz, HOME Kay Managemnt Company served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 (Anderson, Michael)
November 25, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kuir Phillips, Mara B Kniaz, HOME Indian River Associates, LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019 (Anderson, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Cassandra Joy Simmons. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/21/2019. (dvanm, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 24 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Indian River Associates, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Amend/Correct Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/20/2019. (dvanm, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Cassandra J Simmons and Certification of Local Counsel Michael E Anderson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6946018. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
November 19, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Summons Returned Executed Incorrectly by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order issuing new summons to Indian River Associates LLC, #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons)(Anderson, Michael)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kuir Phillips, Mara B Kniaz, HOME Indian River Associates, LLC served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 (Anderson, Michael)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/6/2019. (dvanm, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/6/2019. (dvanm, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/06/2019. (dvanm, )
November 5, 2019 Notice of Correction re #11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine Cone and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920259. , #16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Silverstein and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920325. , #10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brook Allarick Hill and Certification of Local Counsel Azadah Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920133. , #13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Hannah Elizabeth Miller Lieberman and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920295. The signature block on the document does not match the user's login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to refile the document. (dvanm, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Silverstein and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920325. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul E. Poirot and Certification of Local Counsel Michael E. Anderson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920318. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsay Patricia Holmes and Certification of Local Counsel Michael E. Anderson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920309. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Hannah Elizabeth Miller Lieberman and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920295. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles Michael Guzak and Certification of Local Counsel Michael E. Anderson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920277. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine Cone and Certification of Local Counsel Azadeh Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920259. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brook Allarick Hill and Certification of Local Counsel Azadah Erfani Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6920133. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons for Kay Management Company, et al. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons for Paxton Duke Associates by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Kay Management Co., Inc. by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Jack Kay by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Indian River Associates, LLC by HOME, Mara B Kniaz, Kuir Phillips. (Anderson, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6903041.), filed by Mara B Kniaz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Anderson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kniaz, et al. v. Kay Managemnt Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Managemnt Company
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Jack et al
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paxton Duke Associates, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Beauregard Associates Limited Partnership
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian River Associates, LLC
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malibu Circle Associates Limited Partnership
Represented By: Margaret Fonshell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mara B Kniaz
Represented By: Michael Edward Anderson
Represented By: Azadeh Erfani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuir Phillips
Represented By: Michael Edward Anderson
Represented By: Azadeh Erfani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOME
Represented By: Michael Edward Anderson
Represented By: Azadeh Erfani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?