Rodriguez de Estrada v. Hott et al
Petitioner: Maria Rodriguez de Estrada
Respondent: Paul Perry, Russell Hott and William P. Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv01359
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER- GRANTING #4 MOTION to Seal by Maria Rodriguez de Estrada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/21/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SO ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #16 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/20/2019. (lcre, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Maria Rodriguez de Estrada (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Signed Declaration for Unsigned Declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/14/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Sealed Memorandum in Support, Motion to Substitute Signed Declaration for Unsigned Declaration, #8 Sealed Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION to Seal . (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of re #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Sealed Memorandum in Support, Motion to Substitute Signed Declaration for Unsigned Declaration Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Maria Rodriguez de Estrada (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Sealed Memorandum in Support, Motion to Substitute Signed Declaration for Unsigned Declaration by Maria Rodriguez de Estrada. (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 So Ordered re #10 Joint MOTION to Set a Briefing Schedule filed by Russell Hott, William P. Barr, Motions terminated: #10 Joint MOTION to Set a Briefing Schedule filed by Russell Hott, William P. Barr. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/1/2019. (lcre, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Set a Briefing Schedule by William P. Barr, Russell Hott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loftus, Meghan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Elizabeth Loftus on behalf of William P. Barr, Russell Hott (Loftus, Meghan)
October 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (acha, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #3 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2019) Per TCB 11/14/2019 Court Order (acha, ). Modified on 11/14/2019 (acha, ).
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Sealed Document re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Maria Rodriguez de Estrada re #4 MOTION to Seal (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Seal filed by Maria Rodriguez de Estrada. (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal by Maria Rodriguez de Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted Public Version filed by Maria Rodriguez de Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Maria Rodriguez de Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0422-6905500.), filed by Maria Rodriguez de Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez de Estrada v. Hott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maria Rodriguez de Estrada
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Russell Hott
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Meghan Elizabeth Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?