Marshek v. Green Dot Bank et al
Plaintiff: Tyson Marshek
Defendant: Green Dot Bank and Equifax Information Solutions, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01407
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 So Ordered re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Green Dot Bank only filed by Tyson Marshek; dismissing with prejudice Defendant Green Dot Bank. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/30/2019. (c/m 12/30/2019 spar)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Green Dot Bank only by Tyson Marshek (Attachments: #1 Letter)(dest, )
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Solutions, Inc answer due 1/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/26/2019. (rban, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Solutions, Inc. (Montgomery, John)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, John)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Solutions, Inc.; served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019 (pmil, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Green Dot Bank; served on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019 (pmil, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued and given to USM for service as to Equifax Information Solutions, Inc, Green Dot Bank. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Pltf's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 11/12/19. (c/s: Pltf)(pmil, ) Modified on 11/12/2019 to remove seal (pmil, ).
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyson Marshek. (pmil, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Solutions, Inc, Green Dot Bank administratively filed by Tyson Marshek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(pmil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshek v. Green Dot Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Dot Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: John Willard Montgomery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Marshek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?