Lassiter v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Julie C. Lassiter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01440
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Julie C. Lassiter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attorney General, #2 Exhibit US Attorney, #3 Exhibit Regional Counsel)(Farrell, Clifford)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Granted Conditionally: The clerk is ordered to file the complaint. Upon receipt of the completed summons and USM-285 form for each defendant, the clerk will issue a summons. If the completed summons and USM- 285 forms are not submitted as directed, the complaint may be dismissed. The United States marshal is ordered to serve the completed summons with a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant(s). The United States will advance the costs of service. Prisoner plaintiffs are responsible for full payment of the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/15/19. (klau, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued and given to U.S. Marshal on 11/19/19 for service per Order dated 11/15/19 dkt. no. 5 as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out One electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (klau, ).
November 13, 2019 Notice of Correction re [1-2] Exhibit in Forma Pauperis, the filing user has been notified to refile the document using event Motion to proceed in Forma Pauperis. (klau, ) Modified on 11/14/2019 Counsel do not need to refile due to restriction on electronic filing of sealed motion (klau, ).
November 13, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Julie C. Lassiter. (klau, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Julie C. Lassiter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons - US Attorney, #2 Exhibit Summons - Regional Counsel)(Farrell, Clifford)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Nancy A. Berryhill , filed by Julie C. Lassiter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2(Under Seal) Exhibit In Forma Pauperis)(Farrell, Clifford) Modified text on 11/13/2019 Exhibit 2 placed under seal. (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lassiter v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie C. Lassiter
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?