United States of America v. 2018 FTR Cab Truck Isuzu et al
Plaintiff: United Statesof America and United States of America
Defendant: 2018 FTR Cab Truck Isuzu, $5,000 U.S. Currency Seized from Kimberly Diane Drumm, $33,275 U.S. Currency Seized from Joseph Ruis, 2018 Isuzu FTR Cab Truck, 2016 Ferrari California and Assorted Watches Seized from Joseph Ruis
Claimant: Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01448
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/30/2019. (spar)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference; directing that the pretrial conference currently scheduled for January 8, 2020 shall take place on Wednesday, January 22 at 11:00 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/30/2019. (spar)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Karen)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema.. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gill, Robert)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 CLAIM for Civil Forfeiture by Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.. (Gill, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT of Arrest In Rem issued for service by US Marshal. (spar)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America of Filing Application for Warrants in Rem (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Taylor, Karen) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/22/2019) (spar, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/22/2019) (spar, ).
November 13, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (spar)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by United Statesof America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2018 FTR Cab Truck Isuzu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2018 FTR Cab Truck Isuzu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,000 U.S. Currency Seized from Kimberly Diane Drumm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,275 U.S. Currency Seized from Joseph Ruis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2018 Isuzu FTR Cab Truck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2016 Ferrari California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assorted Watches Seized from Joseph Ruis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Statesof America
Represented By: Karen Ledbetter Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Karen Ledbetter Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?