Park v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Jinhyung Park
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Kim Zanotti
Case Number: 1:2019cv01471
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 So Ordered re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Jinhyung Park. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/20/2019. (See order for further details) (acha, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jinhyung Park (Roche, John)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kim Zanotti, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Donald J. Friedman. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/25/2019. (acha, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Donald J. Friedman and Certification of Local Counsel John K. Roche Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6949876. by Jinhyung Park. (Roche, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for G. Zachary Terwilliger by Jinhyung Park. (Roche, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for William Barr by Jinhyung Park. (Roche, John)
November 20, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for USCIS by Jinhyung Park. (Roche, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Kim Zanotti by Jinhyung Park. (Roche, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Kenneth T. Cuccinelli by Jinhyung Park. (Roche, John)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6948714.), filed by Jinhyung Park. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roche, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jinhyung Park
Represented By: John Kuropatkin Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Zanotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?