Connelly et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Connelly, Richard Rehak, Josef Davis, Travis Sides, Michael Parker, Hans Eubanks, Sheng Su, Kin Moy, Zola Thornton and Evgeny Fedorov
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Audi of America, Audi Aktiengesellschaft and Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Case Number: 1:2019cv01487
Filed: November 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant Volkswagen Group of America's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended by 45 days, through 2/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/30/2019. (rban, )
December 24, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Feinman, Justin)
December 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Feinman, Justin)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 MOTION Appoint Special Process Service Server. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/20/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Appoint Special Process Server by Brian Connelly, Josef Davis, Hans Eubanks, Evgeny Fedorov, Kin Moy, Michael Parker, Richard Rehak, Travis Sides, Sheng Su, Zola Thornton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons ReIssued as to Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons ReIssued as to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Re-Issued as to Audi Aktiengesellschaft. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Audi Aktiengesellschaft, Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
November 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (pmil, )
November 23, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. by Brian Connelly, Josef Davis, Hans Eubanks, Evgeny Fedorov, Kin Moy, Michael Parker, Richard Rehak, Travis Sides, Sheng Su, Zola Thornton. (Webster, Steven)
November 23, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft by Brian Connelly, Josef Davis, Hans Eubanks, Evgeny Fedorov, Kin Moy, Michael Parker, Richard Rehak, Travis Sides, Sheng Su, Zola Thornton. (Webster, Steven)
November 23, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Audi Aktiengesellschaft by Brian Connelly, Josef Davis, Hans Eubanks, Evgeny Fedorov, Kin Moy, Michael Parker, Richard Rehak, Travis Sides, Sheng Su, Zola Thornton. (Webster, Steven)
November 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6954698.), filed by Michael Parker, Hans Eubanks, Richard Rehak, Sheng Su, Josef Davis, Travis Sides, Brian Connelly, Evgeny Fedorov, Zola Thornton, Kin Moy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webster, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connelly et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi of America
Represented By: Justin Scott Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audi Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Connelly
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rehak
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josef Davis
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Sides
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Parker
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Eubanks
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheng Su
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kin Moy
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zola Thornton
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evgeny Fedorov
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?