Goya Foods, Inc. v. goya.net et al
Plaintiff: Goya Foods, Inc.
Defendant: goya-dance.org, goya.net, goya-yoga-balet.com, goya-dance.com, goya-balet-yoga.com, goyabaletyoga.com, goyayogadance.com, goya-dance-yoga.com, goyadance.com, mygoya.net, mygoya.com, goyadanceyoga.com, goya.org, goya-yoga-dance.com and goyayogabalet.com
Case Number: 1:2019cv01515
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jonathan Webster Thomas. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/21/2020. (acha, )
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice for A. John Peter Mancini. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 1/21/2020. (acha, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Webster Thomas and Certification of Local Counsel Gary M. Hnath by Goya Foods, Inc.. (Hnath, Gary)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by A. John Peter Mancini and Certification of Local Counsel Gary M. Hnath by Goya Foods, Inc.. (Hnath, Gary)
January 14, 2020 Notice of Correction re #12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Webster Thomas and Certification of Local Counsel Gary M. Hnath Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7022807. , #11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by A. John Peter Mancini and Certification of Local Counsel Gary M. Hnath Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7022806. . The filing user has been notified to re-file the documents as non fillable PDF's with correct signature. (acha, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Webster Thomas and Certification of Local Counsel Gary M. Hnath Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7022807. by Goya Foods, Inc.. (Hnath, Gary)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by A. John Peter Mancini and Certification of Local Counsel Gary M. Hnath Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7022806. by Goya Foods, Inc.. (Hnath, Gary)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 Declaration re #9 Order, Declaration of A. John P. Mancini by Goya Foods, Inc.. (Hnath, Gary)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SERVE NOTICE OF ACTION BY PUBLICATION as follows: 1. Within 14 days of the entry of this Order, Goya shall publish a copy of this Order in either The Washington Post or The Washington Times ---- (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/3/20. (klau, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Goya Foods, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Service by Publication Proposed Order (Hnath, Gary)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Goya Foods, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Service by Publication of Waiver of Hearing (Hnath, Gary)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Goya Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. John P. Mancini, #2 Exhibit 1 to Mancini Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Mancini Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Mancini Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Mancini Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Mancini Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Mancini Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Mancini Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Mancini Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Mancini Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Mancini Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Mancini Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Mancini Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Mancini Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Mancini Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Mancini Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Mancini Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 to Mancini Declaration, #19 Exhibit 18 to Mancini Declaration, #20 Exhibit 19 to Mancini Declaration, #21 Exhibit 20 to Mancini Declaration, #22 Exhibit 21 to Mancini Declaration, #23 Proposed Order)(Hnath, Gary)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Service by Publication by Goya Foods, Inc.. (Hnath, Gary)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the filing of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s)- See Attached. (acha, )
December 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (acha, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Goya Foods, Inc. Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Hnath, Gary)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goya Foods, Inc.. (Hnath, Gary)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6965860.), filed by Goya Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hnath, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goya Foods, Inc. v. goya.net et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goya-dance.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goya.net
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goya-yoga-balet.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goya-dance.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goya-balet-yoga.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goyabaletyoga.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goyayogadance.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goya-dance-yoga.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goyadance.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mygoya.net
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mygoya.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goyadanceyoga.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goya.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goya-yoga-dance.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: goyayogabalet.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goya Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Mitchell Hnath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?