LeGrand v. USP Pollock LA et al
Plaintiff: Martella LeGrand
Defendant: Medical Staff, USP Pollock LA and Risperdone Manufacture
Case Number: 1:2019cv01528
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Martella LeGrand (Attachments: #1 1st page) (spar)
December 17, 2019 Case transferred from Virginia Eastern has been opened in Western District of Louisiana as case 1:19-cv-01601. (aott, )
December 16, 2019 Case electronically transferred to USDC for the Western District for Louisiana. (spar)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to transfer this action the Western District of Louisiana; directing that LeGrand direct all future filings to the Clerks office for the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana; directing the Clerk to close this civil action. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/13/2019. (c/m 12/16/2019 spar)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (c/m 12/5/2019 spar)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medical Staff, Risperdone Manufacture, USP Pollock LA, filed by Martella LeGrand. (Attachments: #1 Prisoners Database, #2 Envelope)(spar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeGrand v. USP Pollock LA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP Pollock LA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risperdone Manufacture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martella LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?