Safety Equipment Institute v. Signature Lacrosse, LLC et, al.
Plaintiff: Safety Equipment Institute
Defendant: Daniel Soviero, Signature Laccrosse, LLC and Signature Lacrosse, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01534
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Defendants, Signature and Daniel Soviero, are liable for trademark infringement, false advertising, counterfeiting, and unfair competition for the advertising and sale of uncertified lacrosse balls bearing the SEI Marks and that defendant Signature is liable for breach of its agreement with SEI (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/26/2020. (lcre, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal Proposed Consent Order by Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero. (Rubinger, James)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Safety Equipment Institute shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Signature Lacrosse, LLCs Counterclaims by Monday, June 1, 2020. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/27/2020. Safety Equipment Institute answer due 6/1/2020. (lcre, ) (Main Document 36 replaced on 4/27/2020) (lcre, ).
April 27, 2020 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Safety Equipment Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fee, James)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim . The counterclaim answer deadline is extended from April 2, 2020 to May 1, 2020. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/30/2020. Safety Equipment Institute answer due 5/1/2020. (lcre, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Safety Equipment Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fee, James)
March 11, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero.(Rubinger, James)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDERED that defendants Signature Lacrosse, LLC and Daniel Soviero must file answers to plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before Wednesday, March 11, 2020. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 03/03/2020. (tran)
March 3, 2020 Signature Lacrosse, LLC answer due 3/11/2020; Daniel Soviero answer due 3/11/2020. (lcre, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED that defendants Signture Lacrosse, LLC and Daniel Sovieromust file answers to plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before Wednesday, March 11, 2020. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/3/2020. (lcre, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 29 Joint Discovery Plan by Safety Equipment Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Fee, James)
February 24, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Safety Equipment Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fee, James)
February 24, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION Regarding Filing of Amended Complaint by Safety Equipment Institute. (Fee, James)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Pro hac vice of Jane Washington Wise. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 2/20/2020. (lcre, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED that defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue (Dkt. #18 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 02/10/2020. (tran)
February 7, 2020 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2020 re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero.James Fee and Jane Wise appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Benjamin Stranzl, Nicolas Ferreiro and James Rubinger appeared on behalf of the defendant.Matter argued. Court will not transfer the case. Order to follow. Court Reporter: P. Kaneshiro-Miller(tran)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED that the hearing currently scheduled for Friday, January 31, 2020 at 10:00 am is RESHCHEDULED to Friday, February 7, 2020 at 10;00 am re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 1/27/2020. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III.(lcre, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rubinger, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue filed by Safety Equipment Institute. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patricia Gleason, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Declaration of Jane W. Wise, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12)(Fee, James)
January 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Hearing Date set for 1/31/2020 re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue (Rubinger, James)
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Washington Wise and Certification of Local Counsel James Kevin Fee Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7010312. by Safety Equipment Institute. (Fee, James)
January 3, 2020 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue (lcre, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Soviero Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Signature corporate location, #3 Exhibit Ex. C Tricia Hock information, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rubinger, James)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signature Lacrosse, LLC answer due 1/17/2020; Daniel Soviero answer due 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 12/27/2019. (rban, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero. (Rubinger, James)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice of Anthony Christopher Soviero. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/20/2019. (lcre, )
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice of Benjamin Stephen Stranzl. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/20/2019. (lcre, )
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice of Nicolas Eric Ferreiro. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/20/2019. (lcre, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Christopher Soviero and Certification of Local Counsel James C. Rubinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6993999. by Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero. (Rubinger, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin Stephen Stranzl and Certification of Local Counsel James C. Rubinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6993602. by Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero. (Rubinger, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicolas Eric Ferreiro and Certification of Local Counsel James C. Rubinger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6993582. by Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero. (Rubinger, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Rubinger on behalf of Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero (Rubinger, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Signature Lacrosse, LLC, Daniel Soviero. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(lcre, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 Report on the filing or determination of an action of a trademark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(lcre, )(c/s)
December 5, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lcre, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for Daniel Soviero by Safety Equipment Institute. (Fee, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Signature Lacrosse, LLC by Safety Equipment Institute. (Fee, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Safety Equipment Institute (AO 120) Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Fee, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safety Equipment Institute. (Fee, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Safety Equipment Institute. (Fee, James)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6970558.), filed by Safety Equipment Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fee, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safety Equipment Institute v. Signature Lacrosse, LLC et, al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Soviero
Represented By: James C. Rubinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Laccrosse, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Lacrosse, LLC
Represented By: James C. Rubinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safety Equipment Institute
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?