Hellebuyck v. Gucci America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ann Hellebuyck
Defendant: Gucci America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01556
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 12) and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 11) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by Friday, June 12, 2020. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. The pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, February 19, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by Friday, February 14, 2020. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/31/20. (tfitz, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by Gucci America, Inc..(Deitch, David)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Discovery due by 6/12/2020.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(awac, )
January 16, 2020 Per LO chambers motions set for 1/17/2020 on the pleadings (clar, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Counts III, IV and V) filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Deitch, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Counts II, IV and V filed by Kimberly Ann Hellebuyck. (Cilman, Alan)
December 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Counts III, IV and V). Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (rban, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Hearing Date re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Counts III, IV and V) (Deitch, David)
December 26, 2019 Notice of Correction re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Counts III, IV and V), #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Counts III, IV and V). The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date. (rban, )
December 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Gucci America, Inc..(Deitch, David)
December 24, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Counts III, IV and V) filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Deitch, David)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Counts III, IV and V) by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deitch, David)
December 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Counts III, IV and V) by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deitch, David)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gucci America, Inc.. (Deitch, David)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal by Gucci America, Inc.. (Deitch, David)
December 12, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. The filing user has been notified to file a Civil Cover Sheet. (acha, )
December 12, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (acha, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6982082.), filed by Gucci America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Deitch, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hellebuyck v. Gucci America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gucci America, Inc.
Represented By: David Brian Deitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Ann Hellebuyck
Represented By: Alan Jay Cilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?