Smith Rangel Consulting, LLC v. John Doe(s)
Plaintiff: Smith Rangel Consulting, LLC and Mattox Global
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Case Number: 1:2019cv01577
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting as modified #2 MOTION for Discovery before r. 26(f) conference. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/27/2019. (rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Discovery before r. 26(f) conference by Smith Rangel Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in support of motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order Proposed order, #9 Waiver of oral argument)(Johnson, Lance)
December 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (pmil, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6987328.), filed by Smith Rangel Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Johnson, Lance) Modified on 12/16/2019 to correct party name (pmil, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith Rangel Consulting, LLC v. John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Rangel Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Lance G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mattox Global
Represented By: Lance G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?