Crisano v. Grimes et al
Plaintiff: Cassie C Crisano
Defendant: Rappahannock Regional Jail, Phil Grimes, Captain Norris and Thomas Foley
Case Number: 1:2019cv01612
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Notice of Correction re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (choy, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 Brief in Support to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Thomas Foley. (Capps, Jeremy)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Thomas Foley. (Capps, Jeremy)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Phil Grimes. (Tureaud, Andrew)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Dkt. No #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cassie C Crisano. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(choy, )
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff shall have sixty (60) days from the date of this Order in which to file her opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 01/16/2020. (choy, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Cassie C Crisano. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(choy, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss by Phil Grimes (Tureaud, Andrew)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Phil Grimes. (Tureaud, Andrew)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Phil Grimes. (Tureaud, Andrew)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Database by Cassie C Crisano. (choy, )
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Jules Tureaud on behalf of Phil Grimes (Tureaud, Andrew)
December 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan (Case reassigned to follow prisoner procedures). (choy, )
December 24, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (choy, )
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6999385.), filed by Phil Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Francuzenko, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crisano v. Grimes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rappahannock Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Grimes
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Represented By: Andrew Jules Tureaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Foley
Represented By: Jeremy David Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassie C Crisano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?