Richmond v. Fairfield Inn & Suites
Plaintiff: Altamese E Richmond and Altamese Elizabeth Richmond
Defendant: Fairfield Inn & Suites, Marriott International, Inc., 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC, Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company and Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01627
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 42 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company. (Maiolo, Tina)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 04/23/20. (pmil, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 40 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth M. Rodriguez and Certification of Local Counsel B. Patrice Clair Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7170976. by 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC, Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P., Marriott International, Inc.. (Clair, Bethany)
April 3, 2020 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marriott International, Inc.. (Clair, Bethany)
April 3, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint by Marriott International, Inc..(Clair, Bethany)
March 13, 2020 Notice of Correction re: #31 Answer to Complaint. The signature block on the document does not match the user's login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to either refile the document or to have the attorney whose signature block appears on the document refile the document. (pmil, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company. (Bernas, Kenneth)
March 11, 2020 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC. (Clair, Bethany)
March 11, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC.(Clair, Bethany)
March 11, 2020 Filing 34 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P.. (Clair, Bethany)
March 11, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P..(Clair, Bethany)
March 11, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company.(Bernas, Kenneth)
March 11, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company.(Maiolo, Tina)
March 11, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Fairfield Inn & Suites. (Party terminated 1/16/2020) (dvanm, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 29 Certificate of Compliance as to 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC served on 3/6/2020 re: Alias Amended Complaint. (pmil, )
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that Pltf's Counsel's #25 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is GRANTED (Attorney Blake Andrew Weiner terminated). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 03/06/20. (pmil, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond re #25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weiner, Blake)
March 5, 2020 Filing 26 Waiver of re #25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support Oral Argument by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond (Weiner, Blake)
March 5, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Memorandum in Support by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake)
March 4, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Marriott International, Inc.; served on 2/19/2020 (pmil, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P.; served on 2/19/2020 (pmil, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company; served on 2/19/2020 (pmil, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond re #20 Summons Issued, (Weiner, Blake)
March 2, 2020 Filing 20 ALIAS AMENDED COMPLAINT Summons Issued for service by State Corporation Commission as to 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out one electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Pltf's Ex Parte #17 Motion for Leave to Reissue Summons and to Expedite Service of Process by the United States Marshals Service is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part . The Motion is granted as to reissuing a second summons for Deft 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC. The Motion is denied as to ordering the United States Marshals service to serve the summons because now that Pltf is represented by counsel, use of the United States Marshals Service is not appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 03/02/20. (pmil, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 18 Waiver of re #17 First MOTION to Expedite Service of Process by US MarshalsFirst MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Summons Oral Argument by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond (Weiner, Blake)
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION to Expedite Service of Process by US Marshals, First MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Summons by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant 44 Alexandria's Registered Agent, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Summons)(Weiner, Blake)
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT Summons Returned Unexecuted as to 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC. (pmil, ) Modified on 2/25/2020 to add text (pmil, ).
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT Summons Issued and given to USM for service as to 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC, Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P., Marriott International, Inc., Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company. (pmil, ) Modified on 2/3/2020 to add text (pmil, ).
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Summons for Defendant Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Summons for Defendant Marriott International, Inc. by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons for Defendant Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P. by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons for Defendant 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons for Defendant Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons for Defendant Marriott International, Inc. by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons for Defendant Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P. by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons for Defendant 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC by Altamese Elizabeth Richmond. (Weiner, Blake)
January 21, 2020 Notice of Correctio: The filing user has been notified that document [document number] is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document re #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons (lcre, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marriott International Inc., 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC, Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P., Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company, filed by Altamese E Richmond.(Weiner, Blake)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Andrew Weiner on behalf of Altamese E Richmond (Weiner, Blake)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fairfield Inn & Suites and given to USMS for Service. (rban, )
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/30/2019. (rban, copy mailed )
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Altamese E Richmond. (choy, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fairfield Inn & Suites (Filing fee $ 400 (not paid).), filed by Altamese E Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(choy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richmond v. Fairfield Inn & Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altamese E Richmond
Represented By: Blake Andrew Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altamese Elizabeth Richmond
Represented By: Blake Andrew Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Inn & Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Bethany Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 44 Alexandria Associates, LLC
Represented By: Bethany Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shar Con Hotel Management & Development Company
Represented By: Tina Marie Maiolo
Represented By: Kenneth Maxwell Bernas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hersha Hospitality Management, L.P.
Represented By: Bethany Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?