TADROUS v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: Akram Tadrous
Defendant: Capital One, National Association, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02917
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Pretrial Order #4. Continuing Initial Status and Rule 16(b) Conferences. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 Pretrial Order #3 - Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Pretrial Order #2 - Appointing Defendants' Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/12/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, c/m 11/12/2019)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Initial Order. Pretrial Order #1 Setting Initial Conference and General Matters. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 11/1/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02292. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER dated 10/2/2019 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Anthony Trenga for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2915) (ztnr) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendants' #8 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that all proceedings and deadlines in this case are STAYED until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 (J.P.M.L. July 31, 2019). So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/22/2019. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toro, John). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on 8/23/2019 (znmw). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019 (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019 (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019 (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion of District Of Columbia Plaintiffs for Transfer to and Consolidation or Coordination of Related Actions in the District of the District Of Columbia, In re: Capital One Consumer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915. by AKRAM TADROUS (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AKRAM TADROUS. Case related to Case No. 19-CV-2265. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6292170) filed by AKRAM TADROUS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TADROUS v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akram Tadrous
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?