GREENSTEIN v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Lara Greenstein
Defendant: Capital One, National Association, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02919
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02307. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER dated 10/2/2019 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Anthony Trenga for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2915) (ztnr) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Case Stayed. (znbn) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendants' #8 Motion to Stay is GRANTED, and the case is STAYED until the JPML rules on consolidation and transfer. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/29/2019. (lcjeb2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toro, John) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by LARA GREENSTEIN. CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE by LARA GREENSTEIN. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by LARA GREENSTEIN. CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 8/20/2019, answer due 10/19/2019. (Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion of District Of Columbia Plaintiffs for Transfer to and Consolidation or Coordination of Related Actions in the District of the District Of Columbia, In re: Capital One Consumer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915. by LARA GREENSTEIN (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Nussbaum, Linda) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LARA GREENSTEIN. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-2265. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6294377) filed by LARA GREENSTEIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Nussbaum, Linda) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/2/2019) (zeg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 10/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREENSTEIN v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lara Greenstein
Represented By: Linda Phyllis Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: John C. Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?