Mallh et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Jonathan Quintevis and Victor Mallh
Defendant: Capital One N.A., Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,, Capital One Financial Corporation, Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Amazon.com Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02932
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-05040. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Virginia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-1: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Virginia for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-1: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Virginia for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. The Court has considered the Defendant Capital One's Motion to Stay or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The Motion is GRANTED. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 (J.P.M.L. July 31, 2019). The stay shall apply to any deadlines or obligations that would be triggered by the filing of an amended complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/24/2019. (Vertus, Miriam) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A, Capital One, N.A.; Corporate Parent none for Capital One Financial Corporation. (Isajiw, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Letter MOTION to Stay all proceedings and deadlines without opposition until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Isajiw, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Warren Gray, Jr on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Gray, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon, #4 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11817564 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Victor Mallh, Jonathan Quintevis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons) (Kurtz, Orin) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mallh et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One N.A.
Represented By: Peter Joseph Isajiw
Represented By: Robert Warren Gray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Represented By: Peter Joseph Isajiw
Represented By: Robert Warren Gray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Peter Joseph Isajiw
Represented By: Robert Warren Gray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Quintevis
Represented By: Orin R. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Mallh
Represented By: Orin R. Kurtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?