Ababseh v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Amjed Ali Ababseh
Defendant: Capital One N.A., Amazon Web Services, Inc., GitHub Inc, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A., and Amazon.com Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02940
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01397. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 MDL 2915 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1); In re Capital One Consumer Data Security Breach Litigation; Eastern District of Virginia; assigned to Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Conditional Transfer Order ; filed by Defendants Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One NA. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1))(Hade, Kellen) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Parties' #10 Stipulated Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Attorney Steven A Miller and Daniel J. Oates added for Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One Financial Corporation, and Capital One NA per #8 Notice of Appearance. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendants Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One NA. Noting Date 9/11/2019, (Hade, Kellen) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corp for Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One NA (Hade, Kellen) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kellen Andrew Hade on behalf of Defendants Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One NA. (Hade, Kellen) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com Inc for Amazon Web Services Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc (Ware, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey A. Ware on behalf of Defendants Amazon Web Services Inc, Amazon.com Inc. (Ware, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen R Basser for Plaintiff Amjed Ali Ababseh, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen R. Basser FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Amjed Ali Ababseh (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5914609 (Turner, Duncan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons) (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5907759), filed by Amjed Ali Ababseh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Turner, Duncan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ababseh v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One N.A.
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Steven A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GitHub Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Steven A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Represented By: Steven A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amjed Ali Ababseh
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Represented By: John G. Emerson
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?