JACOBS v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Jacobs
Defendant: Capital One N.A., Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A., and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02942
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03217. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Eastern District of Virginia. Case transferred electronically to Eastern District of Virginia, IN RE: MDL 2915 on October 17,2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 CLOSED TRANSFER to the Eastern District of Virginia IN RE: CAPITAL ONE CONSUMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION MDL No. 2915, per Certified Transfer Order (CTO-1). (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendants' #10 Motion to Stay or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 (J.P.M.L. July 31, 2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/26/2019. (SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 days from Denial of Motion to Stay , filed by Defendants CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrissey, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE, N.A... (Morrissey, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Morrissey on behalf of Defendants CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. (Morrissey, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Pilgrim on behalf of Defendants CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, CAPITAL ONE, N.A.. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A., CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION, and CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Marie La Fornara on behalf of Plaintiff JEFFREY JACOBS. (La Fornara, Lisa) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A. Toops on behalf of Plaintiff JEFFREY JACOBS. (Toops, Lynn) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Shevitz on behalf of Plaintiff JEFFREY JACOBS. (Shevitz, Richard) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JEFFREY JACOBS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5556952) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Shevitz, Richard) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACOBS v. CAPITAL ONE FINANCIAL CORPORATION et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Pilgrim
Represented By: James J. Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Pilgrim
Represented By: James J. Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Pilgrim
Represented By: James J. Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Jacobs
Represented By: Lisa Marie La Fornara
Represented By: Richard E. Shevitz
Represented By: Lynn A. Toops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?