Randy Zimprich v. Capital One Financial Corporation DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Randy Zimprich
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02943
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:19-cv-01689. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2915, transferring case to USDC, Eastern District of Virginia and assigned to Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. Case transferred electronically. (es)[Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS #8 by Judge James V. Selna. The Motion is GRANTED. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are stayed until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 (J.P.M.L. July 31, 2019). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (es) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation identifying no corporate parent as Corporate Parent. (Lawless, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 BEFORE THE JPML filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John R Lawless, Jr added to party Capital One Financial Corporation(pty:dft)) (Lawless, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Randy Zimprich, (Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Randy Zimprich. (Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24379764 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Randy Zimprich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Daniel S Robinson added to party Randy Zimprich(pty:pla))(Robinson, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randy Zimprich v. Capital One Financial Corporation DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: John R. Lawless, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Zimprich
Represented By: Wesley K. Polischuk
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Represented By: Michael Willard Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?